|
15.10.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
19.04.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.04.2012 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2012 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
18.01.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.10.2009 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the International Representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
24.03.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
28.01.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |