Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1337931

EP1337931 - DOMAIN NAME ACQUISITION AND MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Database last updated on 23.09.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2015  [2015/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snapnames.com, Inc.
115 NW First Avenue, Suite 300
Portland, OR 97209 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Snapnames.com, Inc.
115 NW First Avenue, Suite 300
Portland, OR 97209 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KING, Raymond
4545 SW Northwood Avenue
Portland, OR 97201 / US
02 / WIENER, Ron
411 NW 84th Place
Portland, OR 97229 / US
03 / BAYLES, Len, Albert
1347 Gilmer Drive
Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US
[2003/35]
Representative(s)Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
Former [2012/37]Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
Former [2003/35]Schurack, Eduard F. , et al
Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date01989207.401.11.2001
[2003/35]
WO2001US47967
Priority number, dateUS20000245102P01.11.2000         Original published format: US 245102 P
US20000248341P13.11.2000         Original published format: US 248341 P
[2003/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02056132
Date:18.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1337931
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002
[2003/35]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US06.03.2003
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/173
[2003/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/35]
Extension statesAL22.05.2003
LT22.05.2003
LV22.05.2003
MK22.05.2003
RO22.05.2003
SI22.05.2003
TitleGerman:DOMAIN-NAMEN-ANSCHAFFUNGS-UND -VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2003/35]
English:DOMAIN NAME ACQUISITION AND MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD[2003/35]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'ACQUISITION ET DE GESTION DE NOMS DE DOMAINE[2003/35]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2003National basic fee paid 
22.05.2003Search fee paid 
22.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedApplication refused, date of legal effect [2014/37]
31.05.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
21.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/14]
05.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
15.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/14]
15.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/37]
15.11.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/09]
08.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/09]
Appeal following examination31.05.2012Appeal received No.  T2017/12
31.05.2012Statement of grounds filed
21.10.2014Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
07.06.2013Date of oral proceedings
12.06.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2007
Request for re-establishment of rights:31.05.2012Date of receipt
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
20.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201313   M06   Not yet paid
30.11.201414   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
International search[YE]US2002010795
 [YE]US2002019800
 [YE]US2002065903
 [Y]US2002042693
 [AE]US2002010767
 [A]US6016512
 [YE]US2001037253
 [L]  DomainNICnames.com about page, You Domain Name Resource Center, Copyright 1998-2000, page 2, expiringsoon.com, pages 1-3, XP002953625