EP1328734 - LINEAR MOTION BEARING SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON INDUSTRIES, INC. 2 Channel Drive Port Washington NY 11050 / US | [2006/06] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states THOMSON INDUSTRIES, INC. 2 Channel Drive Port Washington NY 11050 / US | ||
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states THOMSON INDUSTRIES, INC. Two Channel Drive Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALESSANDRO, Frank 23-30 204th Street Bayside, NY 11360 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Scott 11 Belleview Avenue Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | 03 /
NG, Allison 445 East 14th Street Apartment 3F New York, NY 10009 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01993353.0 | 24.10.2001 | [2003/30] | WO2001US50897 | Priority number, date | US20000242850P | 24.10.2000 Original published format: US 242850 P | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02055895 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1328734 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1328734 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/06 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
F16C29/069 (EP,US);
F16C29/06 (KR);
F16C29/001 (EP,US);
F16C29/0697 (EP,US);
F16C29/123 (EP,US);
F16C2300/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LINEARLAGERSEGMENT | [2003/30] | English: | LINEAR MOTION BEARING SEGMENT | [2003/30] | French: | SEGMENT DE PALIER A MOUVEMENT LINEAIRE | [2003/30] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/30] | 25.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2006 | BE | 08.02.2006 | CH | 08.02.2006 | CY | 08.02.2006 | FI | 08.02.2006 | LI | 08.02.2006 | NL | 08.02.2006 | TR | 08.02.2006 | DK | 08.05.2006 | GR | 09.05.2006 | ES | 19.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | IE | 24.10.2006 | LU | 24.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
TR | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
LU | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 19.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4005913 (THOMSON JR JOHN B) [X] 1,4,8,15,17,20 * the whole document *; | [A]US4128278 (HEADEN WILLIAM E, et al) [A] 1,4,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4227751 (ALBERT ERNST) [A] 1* column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 2; figures 2-6 *; | [A]GB2100365 (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH) [A] 1 * page 3, line 72 - page 4, line 83; figure 4 *; | [A]WO9925983 (THOMSON IND INC [US], et al) [A] 2,3,6,7,10-12 * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 26; figures 2-8 * |