Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1346304

EP1346304 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING A CORPORATE ENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Macrossan, Neal William
20 Price Street, Wooloowin Brisbane
Queensland 4030 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
Macrossan, Neal William
20 Price Street, Wooloowin
Brisbane, Queensland 4030 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/39]
Representative(s)Butler, Michael John
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]Butler, Michael John
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date01997756.023.11.2001
[2003/39]
WO2001AU01526
Priority number, dateAU2000PP0165423.11.2000         Original published format: AU PP165400
[2003/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0242953
Date:30.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1346304
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU30.05.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2003/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER KORPORATIONSENTITÄT[2003/39]
English:A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING A CORPORATE ENTITY[2003/39]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR CREER UNE ENTREPRISE[2003/39]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2003National basic fee paid 
20.06.2003Search fee paid 
20.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
20.06.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
03.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/49]
13.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
International search[A]WO9808176  (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC [US]);
 [A]US6006242  (POOLE DONALD L [US], et al)
 [XO]  - "The internet leader in providing incorporation services", WELCOME TO BUSINESS FILINGS, INC., (1996), page 1, URL: http://www.bizfilings.com, XP002968235
 [XO]  - "www.corporate.com; Incorporate Now!", (1993), page 1, URL: http://www.corporate.com, XP002968236
 [XO]  - "Incorporate a business incorporation online incorporating", (1997), page 1, URL: http://www.mycorporation.com, XP002968237
 [XO]  - "Incorporation services - start a business online! $69", page 1, URL: http://www.gettingincorporated.com, XP002968238
 [A]  - RABIN TAYLOR-PARETS, "Getting Inc.", (19971215), URL: http://www2.inc.com/search/13510-print.html, XP002968709
 [A]  - "Why pay a lawyer? Use the WEB, 301 great ideas for using technology", (19990101), URL: http://www2.inc.com/search/10125-print.html, XP002968710
 [A]  - MIE-YUN LEE, "The dollars and sense of incorporating online", (2001), URL: http://www2.inc.com/search/20198-print.html, XP002968711