EP1337191 - VASCULAR SNARE AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERIT MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 1600 Merit Parkway South Jordan, UT 84095 / US | [2009/34] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Hatch Medical LLC 1415 Woodland Lake Drive Snellville, GA 30078 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVENSCROFT, Adrian, C. 21 Bishop Road Rochester, MA 02770 / US | 02 /
GIANNESCHI, Paul, R. 1415 Woodland Lake Drive Snellville, GA 30078 / US | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/35] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01998271.9 | 27.11.2001 | [2003/35] | WO2001US44225 | Priority number, date | US20000722826 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: US 722826 | [2003/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0243600 | Date: | 06.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1337191 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1337191 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/50 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÄSSSCHLINGE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BILDUNG | [2003/35] | English: | VASCULAR SNARE AND METHOD OF FORMING THE SAME | [2003/35] | French: | PIEGE VASCULAIRE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2010
10.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Read, David Graham WP Thompson Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB Opponent's representative WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2010
10.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE Read, David Graham W. P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB Opponent's representative W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | 09.07.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.01.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2011 | 14.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.12.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.01.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | LU | 27.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | PT | 04.01.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/21] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
LU | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4790812 (HAWKINS JR IRVIN F [US], et al) [Y] 19,34* figure 6 *; | [Y]WO9617634 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,11-15,17,18,20-26,28,31-33,35 * page 17, lines 9-20; figure 6 * * figures 1,1A *; | [Y]WO9916363 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-35 * abstract * * page 8, lines 12-18; claim 14 * * figures 2B,7C * * page 10, lines 1-7; figure 6 *; | [Y]US6086557 (MOREJOHN DWIGHT P [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,29 * column 7, lines 19-22 * * column 6, lines 45-66 *; | [Y]WO0053106 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 8,16,27,30 * page 3, lines 4-7; figures 1A,9C,9H * | International search | [X]US6086577 (KEN CHRISTOPHER G M [US], et al) |