|
02.09.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.04.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.04.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.04.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.09.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
75 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.11.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
130 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |