|
13.09.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
03.05.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.10.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.09.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
48 |
|
27.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.07.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
59 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
114 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
14.08.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
32 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
48 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
25.05.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.04.2010 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2010 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.02.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
59 |
|
20.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
86 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
42 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
40 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
44 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
162 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
62 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
41 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
151 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
104 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
104 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
150 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2005 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.03.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.02.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2003 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2003 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |