|
05.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
19.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.02.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.06.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
03.01.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
88 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
80 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
88 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.04.2003 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |