EP1345399 - Method for the control of AIN type services in a packet-switched network by DTMF tones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lueken, Joachim Stroblstrasse 13 80686 München / DE | [2003/38] | Application number, filing date | 02005668.5 | 12.03.2002 | [2003/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345399 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M7/00, H04L12/64, H04Q3/00 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04L65/1096 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/169 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04M7/1295 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung von im Intelligenten Netzwerk üblichen Diensten im paketvermittelten Netzwerk mittels DTMF-Tönen | [2003/38] | English: | Method for the control of AIN type services in a packet-switched network by DTMF tones | [2003/38] | French: | Méthode pour le controle par des signaux DTMF des services de type réseau intelligent dans un réseau de commutation par paquets | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0077992 (MCIWORLDCOM INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * page 11, lines 3-32; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1109368 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0039]; figure 4 *; | [X] - BHARATIA, V; CULPEPPER B, Internet Draft; draft-culpepper-sip-info-event-00.txt; SIP INFO Method for Event Reporting, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FOREC, (20000418), XP002206928 [X] 1-4,8-11 * page 18 - page 4 * |