EP1347641 - Free projection display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neddermeyer, Andreas Einsteinstrasse 113 81675 München / DE | [2003/39] | Application number, filing date | 02006212.1 | 19.03.2002 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347641 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74, G02B27/01 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
G02B27/0101 (EP);
G02B27/01 (EP);
H04N9/31 (EP);
G02B2027/0118 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/25] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Projektionsfreie Anzeigevorrichtung | [2003/39] | English: | Free projection display device | [2003/39] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage exempt de projection | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 25.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9529555 (DIELECTRIC SYST INT [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 6, line 12 - page 9, line 13 * * page 10, line 5 - page 20, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]US6034807 (LITTLE MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 7 ** column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 15; figure 1 *; | [DA] - SMITH R ET AL., "Application Specific Integrated Lenses and Filters for Microdisplays using Electrically Switchable Bragg Grating Technology", PROCEEDING OF SPIE, (20001106), vol. 4207, pages 31 - 38, XP008007434 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.411768 |