|
10.09.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2010 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
12 |
|
26.01.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
07.11.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2006 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
58 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
18.04.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
24 |