EP1353536 - A LED bulb for night-light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states All-Line Inc. 9th Fl., 102 Kuang-Fu S.Rd. Taipei / TW | [2003/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stekelenburg, Albert 9th. Fl., 102 Kuang-fu S. Road Tapei / TW | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | LOUIS- PÖHLAU- LOHRENTZ Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007900.0 | 09.04.2002 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353536 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
F21K9/232 (EP,US);
H05B45/00 (EP,US);
H05B45/37 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/28] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | LED Lampe für Nachtleuchte | [2003/42] | English: | A LED bulb for night-light | [2003/42] | French: | Ampoule à diodes électroluminescentes pour veilleuse | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 16.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/20] | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4211955 (RAY STEPHEN W [US]) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1-7 *; | [XY]US5463280 (JOHNSON JAMES C [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 55 - column 6, line 66; figures 1-7 * [Y] 4,6,7; | [X]US5575459 (ANDERSON ROBERT A [CA]) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5921660 (YU WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6044202 (JUNKEL ERIC F [US]) [X] 5 * column A; figures 1-18 *; | [Y]US6150771 (PERRY BRADFORD J [US]) [Y] 4,8 * column 7, line 53 - column 9, line 58; figures 11A-13 *; | [X]US6149283 (CONWAY KATHRYN M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US6184628 (RUTHENBERG DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1* column A; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO0182657 (COLOR KINETICS INC [US]) [X] 5 * page 19, line 20 - page 21, line 15; figures 11-13 * [Y] 6-8 |