|
15.05.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
17.09.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.09.2010 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.01.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |