EP1260908 - Data transfer control device, electronic equipment, and data transfer control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamihara, Yoshiyuki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Takuya c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010402.2 | 08.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010143431 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001143431 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260908 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260908 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260908 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G06F13/40 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP,US);
G06F13/38 (KR);
G06F13/28 (EP,US);
G06F13/4027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | G06F13/12, G06F13/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | Datensteueranlage, elektronisches Gerät und Verfahren zur Übertragungssteuerung | [2002/48] | English: | Data transfer control device, electronic equipment, and data transfer control method | [2002/48] | French: | Dispositif de commande de données, équipement électronique et procédé de commande de transfert de données | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | BE | 03.08.2005 | CH | 03.08.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | IT | 03.08.2005 | LI | 03.08.2005 | TR | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | ES | 14.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/37] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IT | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
ES | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9963448 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,9-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - line 35 * * page 6, line 16 - line 32 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 16 * * page 9, line 36 - page 10, line 29 * [Y] 4-8,14,15; | [A]US6128673 (ARONSON MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 7, line 29 - line 47; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US6185641 (DUNNIHOO JEFFREY CLAY [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, Mitsubishi Digital ASSP M66290A USB Application Note, Ver. 1.0 Rev. C, MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION, (20001120), XP002234426 [Y] 4-8,14,15 * page 8, line 19; figures 3-2 * * page 10, paragraph L * |