blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1270928

EP1270928 - Axial piston pump with center inlet fill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.05.2010
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.06.2010  [2010/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Caterpillar Inc.
Intellectual Property Department, 100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gibson, Dennis, c/o Caterpillar Inc.
Intellectual Property Dept., 100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US
02 / Keyster, Eric S., c/o Caterpillar Inc.
Intellectual Property Dept., 100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/01]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date02010585.410.05.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateUS2001088474819.06.2001         Original published format: US 884748
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1270928
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
ClassificationIPC:F02M59/08
[2003/01]
CPC:
F04B1/146 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Axialkolbenpumpe mit Zentralausfüllung[2003/01]
English:Axial piston pump with center inlet fill[2003/01]
French:Pompe à pistons axiaux du type de refoulement central[2003/01]
Examination procedure23.02.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/14]
deletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/16]
01.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/26]
26.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inby applicantUS6035828
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.