EP1265021 - Protective cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERITAS AG Stettiner Strasse 1-9 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmrich, Michael Am Sportfeld 20 63589 Linsengericht / DE | 02 /
Reinig, Michael Birsteiner Strasse 36 63636 Brachtal / DE | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011762.8 | 27.05.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | DE2001209475U | 07.06.2001 Original published format: DE 20109475 U | [2002/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1265021 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1265021 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265021 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L57/00, B65D59/06 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B65D59/06 (EP);
F16L57/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | RO | 30.05.2003 | Title | German: | Schutzkappe | [2002/50] | English: | Protective cap | [2002/50] | French: | Capuchon de protection | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB757918 (STADIUM LTD) [A] 16-21 * page 1, columns 35-83; figure - *; | [A]US3186573 (LUDVIG SALMINEN PAAVO VIKTOR) [A] 16-21 * figure - *; | [Y]US3318488 (ODEN BARNES CHARLES) [Y] 11-14 * column 1, lines 10-23 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 24; claims 1,2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE2439831 (SADEVA FA) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,16 * page 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * figure - * [Y] 11-14; | [XA]DE8414522U (MANNESMANN AG) [X] 1-5,8,9 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 15 * * figure - * [A] 6,7,10; | [A]US5085332 (GETTIG WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 11-15 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0750150 (HENN GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [X] 22,24,25 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 15 * * figures 1-6 *[A] 23; | [Y]US6105817 (PONTON THIERRY [FR]) [Y] 11-13 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 65; figure 4 * |