EP1279531 - Air outlet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG Am Pulverhäuschen 7 67677 Enkenbach/Alsenborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG Am Pulverhäuschen 7 67677 Enkenbach/Alsenborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stiehl, Udo Nelkenstrasse 106 67691 Hochspeyer / DE | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Sties, Jochen Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/05] | Sties, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02014963.9 | 09.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | DE2001136376 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10136376 | [2003/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1279531 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1279531 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/24 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B60H1/249 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/31] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Luftausströmer | [2003/05] | English: | Air outlet | [2003/05] | French: | Bouche d'air | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11301363 ; | [X]WO0148865 (HIRSCHMANN ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, lines 39-61; figures 1-4; claims 6,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11301363 A 19991102 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |