EP1298702 - Amalgam retainer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM-SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street 01923 Danvers, MA / US | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lima, Joseph-V 3 Pyburn Avenue Salem, MA 01970 / US | 02 /
Pearson, Nicolas 2970, Des Grand-Ducs Drummondville, Quebec J2C 7N3 / CA | 03 /
Wenzel, David C. 11 Osprey Lane Newmarket, NH 03857 / US | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Patentanwalt Hofmarkstrasse 10 86447 Aindling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Patentanwalt Hofmarkstrasse 10 86447 Aindling / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Lemke, Jörg-Michael Hofmarkstrasse 10 Arnhofen 86447 Aindling / DE | ||
Former [2009/33] | Raiser, Franz Osram GmbH Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | Pokorny, Gerd OSRAM GmbH, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02017395.1 | 02.08.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | US20010963044 | 25.09.2001 Original published format: US 963044 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1298702 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1298702 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298702 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/24, H01J61/30, H01J65/04, H01J61/52, H01J61/28 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
H01J7/22 (EP,US);
H01J61/00 (KR);
H01J61/28 (EP,US);
H01J65/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/14] | H01J61/24, H01J61/30, H01J65/04, H01J61/52 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/34] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Amalgamsperre | [2003/14] | English: | Amalgam retainer | [2003/14] | French: | Barrière pour amalgame | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6175197 (KLING MICHAEL R [US]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US5834905 (GODYAK VALERY A [US], et al) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5412289 (THOMAS ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5294867 (GROSSMAN MARK W [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH11345592 ; | [A]JPS6158154 ; | [A]JPH04137451 ; | [A]US2091915 (ELDER THOMAS A) [A] * column 1, lines 22-31; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH01185705 ; | [A]JP2001076673 ; | [A]JPH03171529 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11345592 A 19991214 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860802), vol. 010, no. 221, Database accession no. (E - 424), & JP61058154 A 19860325 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920828), vol. 016, no. 408, Database accession no. (E - 1255), & JP04137451 A 19920512 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891025), vol. 013, no. 471, Database accession no. (P - 949), & JP01185705 A 19890725 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001076673 A 20010323 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911021), vol. 015, no. 412, Database accession no. (E - 1124), & JP03171529 A 19910725 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPS60218757 | by applicant | JPS60218757B | US5412289 | US5294867 |