EP1289318 - Method and system for measuring perceptual distortion in images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Islam, Asad 528 Santa Fe Trail No. 245, Irving, TX 75063 / US | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02017540.2 | 06.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | US20010928971 | 13.08.2001 Original published format: US 928971 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289318 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/00 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H04N17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Messen der perzeptuellen Verzerrung in Bildern | [2003/10] | English: | Method and system for measuring perceptual distortion in images | [2003/10] | French: | Procédé et système pour mesurer la distorsion perceptive d' images | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5329379 (RODRIGUEZ ARTURO A [US], et al) [A] 1,17,28 * column 3, line 10 - column 8, line 64 *; | [A]US5446492 (WOLF STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1,17,28 * column 3, line 15 - column 11, line 52 *; | [A]EP0827346 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,17,28 * column 27, line 24 - line 41 ** column 30, line 14 - line 36 *; | [A]WO9943161 (NDS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,17,28 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 25 *; | [A]EP0940996 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL]) [A] 1,17,28 * page 4, line 43 - page 8, line 32 *; | [A]WO0048407 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 1,17,28 * page 3, line 21 - page 14, line 5 * |