|
01.02.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.01.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.04.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
28 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
23 |
|
27.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.04.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
20.08.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2010 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may no longer be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Brief notification setting aside the communication about the intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
13.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Brief notification setting aside the communication about the intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.08.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.10.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2005 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2003 |
Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |