EP1298933 - Video telecommunication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong,Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jin Soo 505-1305 Geoyeo 5 danji Apt., Geoyeo 2-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Ji Eun 106-1505 Useong Apt, Yangjae 1-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg), Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021378.1 | 24.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | KR20010059567 | 26.09.2001 Original published format: KR 2001059567 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1298933 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1298933 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/025, G06T5/00, G06T7/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
H04N19/20 (EP,US);
H04N7/141 (KR);
G06V40/161 (KR);
H04N19/23 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04N9/75 (KR);
G06T2207/30201 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/14] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/24] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Videofernmeldesystem | [2003/14] | English: | Video telecommunication system | [2003/14] | French: | Système de télécommunication vidéo | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 01.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5469536 (BLANK ARTHUR M [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 28; figures 1,2,4a-h * * column 10, line 63 - column 11, line 19 * * column 16, line 4 - line 32 * * column 17, line 41 - column 18, line 1; figure 7 * * column 28, line 1 - column 30, line 51; figures 18-19d * * column 33, line 29 - column 34, line 13 * * column 35, line 47 - column 36, line 6 * * column 37, line 37 - column 38, line 6 * * column 41, line 7 - line 41 * [A] 16-18 [Y] 15,19; | [A]EP0877274 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | RO116685 [ ] (FX DESIGN SRL [RO]) [ ] * the whole document *; | KR20010038032 [ ] (WEB4US [KR]); | [XA]EP1115254 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,8,11,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0160] * [A] 2,4-6,9,10,13,16-19; | [XAY] - KAUFF P ET AL, "FUNCTIONAL CODING OF VIDEO USING A SHAPE-ADAPTIVE DCT ALGORITHM AND AN OBJECT-BASED MOTION PREDICTION TOOLBOX", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199702), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 181 - 195, XP000678890 [X] 1,3,5-12,14,15 * page 181, column L, paragraph 1 - page 183, column L, paragraph L; figure 1 * * page 184, column L, paragraph 3 - page 184, column R, line 2; figure 2 * * page 185, column R, paragraph L * * page 186, column L, paragraph L * * page 189, column L, paragraph 1 - page 189, column R, paragraph 2; figure 8 * * page 192, column R, paragraph L - page 193, column L, paragraph 1 * [A] 16-19 [Y] 2,4,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.554429 | [XA] - "MPEG-4 OVERVIEW - (V.18 - SINGAPORE VERSION)", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 N4030, (200103), pages 1 - 69, XP000984360 [X] 1-4,8,9,11-14 * sections 1. - 1.2 with figure 1; sections 2.4.3; 2.4.5; 9. - 9.3; 9.8.3; 9.9, 9.11 with figure 16 * [A] 5-7,10,15-19 | [XA] - "Process for Replacing the Background in Shots", ROPATENTSEARCH, Romanian State Office for Inventions and Trademarks, (19970829), Database accession no. 00116685, XP002349341 [X] 1,3,11,12 * English abstract * [A] 2,4-10,13-19 | [YA] - "SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OFFERING ELECTRONIC MAIL SERVICE", XX, (20010515), XP002349340 [Y] 2,4,13 * column A * [A] 1,3,5-12,14-19 | [YA] - DOCKSTADER SHILOH L ET AL, "Real-time object tracking and human face detection in cluttered scenes", PROC SPIE INT SOC OPT ENG; PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING 2000 SOCIETY OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS, BELLINGHAM, WA, USA, (2000), vol. 3974, pages 957 - 968, XP002386931 [Y] 15,19 * abstract * * sections 1, 2, 4.2, 5-7 and figures 2, 4 * [A] 1-14,16-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.382934 | [YA] - LING GUAN; S.Y. KUNG; JAN LARSEN, Multimedia Image and Video Processing, BOCA RATON LONDON NEW YORK WASHINGTON, D.C., PAGES 113-130, CRC PRESS, (20000823), XP002387028 [Y] 15,19 * sections 5.5 and 5.6 * [A] 1-14,16-18 | [YA] - SALEMBIER P ET AL, "REGION-BASED REPRESENTATIONS OF IMAGE AND VIDEO: SEGMENTATION TOOLSFOR MULTIMEDIA SERVICES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199912), vol. 9, no. 8, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1147 - 1169, XP000873442 [Y] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14,16-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.809153 | [A] - I. PITAS, C. KOTROPOULOS, A. NIKOLAIDIS, C. TSEKERIDOU, "Algorithms for face localisation, facial feature extraction and tracking", INTERNATIONAL ORGANIASATION FOR STANDARDISATION ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11, MPEG, M2880, (19971001), pages 1 - 14, XP002386932 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |