EP1329828 - Order processing method and system for commodities having dimensional specifications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JUKEN SANGYO CO., LTD. 1-1, Mokuzaikou-Minami, Hatsukaichi-shi Hiroshima 738-8502 / JP | [2003/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamoto, Yusho 19-18, Ajini 4-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima 738-0054 / JP | 02 /
Yoshio, Uemura 2-8-13, Yahata, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5116 / JP | 03 /
Kanbara, Takashi 10-594, 6-ban, Suga Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima 738-0017 / JP | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Reichel, Wolfgang, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Reichel, Wolfgang, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg, Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Patentanwälte, Parkstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021958.0 | 30.09.2002 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | JP20020009826 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002009826 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329828 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1329828 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/30] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/05] |
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Bearbeiten von Bestellungen für Waren mit Massangaben | [2003/30] | English: | Order processing method and system for commodities having dimensional specifications | [2003/30] | French: | Système et méthode de traitement de commande de marchandises ayant des spécifications de dimension | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/40] | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001005831 (LEWIN ASAF [IL], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 9 - page 2, paragraphs 15,17,21 * * page 3, paragraphs 32,48,49 * * page 5, paragraphs 88,89,91,92 * * page 9, paragraph 147 - page 11, paragraph 153 *; | [X]US2001037254 (GLIKMAN ADI [IL]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 14 - page 2, paragraphs 37,38 * * page 3, paragraphs 39,40,42 * * page 4, paragraphs 46,47; claims 1,9,24 *; | [A]US2001037261 (ISHITSUKA SEIICHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 55,56,61-64 ** page 5, paragraphs 145,147-151 - page 6, paragraphs 156-159 *; | [X]US2001042014 (LOWRY BRIAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 13 - page 3, paragraph 25 * * page 4, paragraphs 34,36,38,42,45 * |