blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1279527

EP1279527 - Trailer coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
[2015/02]
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2003/05]For all designated states
ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE HANS RIEHLE GmbH
Im Bornrain
71696 Möglingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gentner, Wolfgang
Karlstrasse 28
71254 Ditzingen-Heimerdingen / DE
02 / Kleb, Emmerich
Am Feldle 17
71606 Markgröningen / DE
03 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstrasse 37
71679 Asperg / DE
04 / Riehle, Hans
Salonallee 17
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
 [2003/05]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/35]
Former [2003/05]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date02024102.221.03.1997
[2003/05]
Priority number, dateDE1996101295901.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19612959
[2003/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1279527
Date:29.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1279527
Date:26.03.2003
[2003/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1279527
Date:28.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1279527
Date:26.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:B60D1/54, B60D1/52
[2003/13]
CPC:
B60D1/246 (EP,US); B60D1/52 (EP,US); B60D1/54 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/05]B60D1/52, B60D1/54
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2015/35]
Former [2003/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung[2003/05]
English:Trailer coupling[2003/05]
French:Attelage de remorque[2003/05]
Examination procedure13.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
25.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2005Fee for grant paid
23.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00101824.1  / EP1002671
EP97104849.1  / EP0799732
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.09.2006  22.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
FAC Frank Abels Consulting & Technology GmbH
Hans-Krüger-Str. 34-46
29633 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder Walter Ebert
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Achenbachstrasse 59
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  27.09.2006  16.10.2006  ADMISSIBLE
AL-KO Kober AG
Ichenhauser Strasse 14
D-89359 Kötz / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al
Ernicke & Ernicke
Beim Glaspalast 1
86153 Augsburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/32]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2006  22.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
FAC Frank Abels Consulting & Technology GmbH
Hans-Krüger-Str. 34-46
29633 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder Walter Ebert
Patentanwälte Achenbachstrasse 59
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  27.09.2006  16.10.2006  ADMISSIBLE
AL-KO Kober AG
Ichenhauser Strasse 14
D-89359 Kötz / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Former [2008/34]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2006  22.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
FAC Frank Abels Consulting & Technology GmbH
Hans-Krüger-Str. 34-46
29633 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder, Wolf-Dietrich
Feder Walter Ebert Patentanwälte Goethestrasse 38 A
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  27.09.2006  16.10.2006  ADMISSIBLE
AL-KO Kober AG
Ichenhauser Strasse 14
D-89359 Kötz / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Former [2008/32]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2006  22.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
FAC Frank Abels Consulting & Technology GmbH
Hans-Krüger-Str. 34-46
29633 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder, Wolf-Dietrich
Goethestrasse 38A
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  27.09.2006  16.10.2006  ADMISSIBLE
AL-KO Kober AG
Ichenhauser Strasse 14
D-89359 Kötz / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Former [2006/44]
Opponent(s)01  22.09.2006   
FAC Frank Abels Consulting & Technology GmbH
Hans-Krüger-Str. 34-46
29633 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Feder, Wolf-Dietrich
Dominikanerstrasse 37
D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  27.09.2006   
AL-KO Kober AG
Ichenhauser Strasse 14
D-89359 Kötz / DE
Opponent's representative
Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke, Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
27.11.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.09.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
10.01.2012Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.02.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.02.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.04.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.07.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition25.04.2012Appeal received No.  T1013/12
19.06.2012Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
28.10.2008Appeal received No.  T2082/08
02.01.2009Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2011Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
10.03.2011Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
13.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT28.12.2005
AT21.03.2006
DK28.03.2006
GB28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
CH31.03.2006
LI31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
NL01.10.2007
[2008/09]
Former [2007/46]IT28.12.2005
AT21.03.2006
DK28.03.2006
GB28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
CH31.03.2006
LI31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2007/38]IT28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GB28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
CH31.03.2006
LI31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2007/27]DK28.03.2006
GB28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
CH31.03.2006
LI31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2007/13]DK28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
CH31.03.2006
LI31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2007/10]DK28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
CH31.03.2006
LI31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/52]DK28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/48]SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/34]SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
Former [2006/27]SE28.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US3640550  (PEARSON HERBERT IRVIN) [A] 1 * figures 6,7 *;
 [AD]DE2619913  (VOLVO AB) [AD] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE2835920  (STEINBOCK GMBH) [A] 22* page 20, line 24 - page 24, line 4; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US4744583  (BLACKWOOD LLOYD [US]) [A] 22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0288366  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]WO9115374  (JSM KONSULT HB [SE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *
by applicantDE2619913
OppositionUS2733936
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.