EP1334953 - Method for severing sheets of glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/33] | Method and apparatus for severing sheets of glass | ||
[2006/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEGLA Fahrzeug- u. Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 21 D-37688 Beverungen / DE | [2007/14] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states HEGLA Fahrzeug- u. Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 21 D-37688 Beverungen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glaser, Siegfried Am Kapellenberg 53 37688 Beverungen / DE | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026809.0 | 28.11.2002 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | DE20021005320 | 08.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205320 | [2003/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1334953 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1334953 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1334953 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03B33/033, C03B33/023, C03B33/037, G01N3/20 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
C03B33/033 (EP);
B65G2249/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/33] | C03B33/033 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Brechen von Glasplatten | [2006/43] | English: | Method for severing sheets of glass | [2006/43] | French: | Procédé pour rompre des feuilles de verre | [2006/43] |
Former [2003/33] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Brechen von Glasplatten | ||
Former [2003/33] | Method and apparatus for severing sheets of glass | ||
Former [2003/33] | Procédé et dispositif pour rompre des feuilles de verre | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | FR | 04.04.2007 | GB | 04.04.2007 | IE | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | LU | 28.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 28.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
GB | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 04.04.2007 | |
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 15.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000154032 ; | [A]US1920641 (HEICHERT HERMAN S) [A] 28-30* Seite 1, Zeilen 30-91, Fig. 1-8 *; | [XY]EP0402342 (LISEC PETER [AT]) [X] 1,26,28,31-34 * the whole document * [Y] 27; | [XY]US5165585 (LISEC PETER [AT]) [X] 26,28-30 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 30; figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 45 - line 60 * [Y] 27,31-34; | [XY]EP0587542 (COOPMES SCARL [IT]) [X] 26,28-30 * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 46; figures 5-10 * * column 7, line 38 - column 8, line 9 * [Y] 27,31-34; | [XY]AT399144B (LISEC PETER [AT]) [X] 26,28-30 * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 14; figures 3a-3c * [Y] 27,31-34; | [XY]WO0198368 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [X] 26,28,31,32,34 * page 5, line 12 - line 20 * * page 10, line 4 - line 29 * * page 13, line 8 - line 21; figure 3; claims 1,14,15 * [Y] 27,33; | [XY] - H. SCHOLZE, Glas, BERLIN, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1988), XP002279374 [X] 1-4,10-12,14-16,26,27 * page 243, paragraph 3.5.2.3 - page 248 * [Y] 20 | [XY] - S.J.SCHNEIDER, Ceramics and Glasses, MATERIALS PARK,OHIO, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (2000), XP002279375 [X] 1-4,10,11,14,15 * page 635 - page 644 * [Y] 20 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000154032 A 20000606 (HOYA CORP) [Y] 27 * abstract * |