EP1323473 - Monodispersed anion exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klipper, Reinhold, Dr. Geilenkircher Str. 29 50933 Köln / DE | 02 /
Halle, Olaf, Dr. Wolfskaul 4 51061 Köln / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Claudia, Dr. Fliederweg 12 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 04 /
Podszun, Wolfgang, Dr. Roggendorfstr. 55 51061 Köln / DE | 05 /
Seidel, Rüdiger, Dr. Lohrbergstr. 16a 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 06 /
Soest, Hans-Karl Im Bienengarten 21 51147 Köln / DE | [2003/27] | Application number, filing date | 02026973.4 | 04.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | DE2001161979 | 17.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10161979 | [2003/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323473 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323473 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323473 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J41/04, B01J41/14, C08F20/56, C08F8/32 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
C08F20/56 (EP,US);
B01J39/04 (EP,US);
B01J39/18 (EP,US);
B01J41/05 (EP,US);
B01J41/07 (EP,US);
B01J41/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B01J39/04, B01J41/05 (EP,US);
B01J39/04, B01J41/07 (US,EP);
B01J39/18, B01J41/14 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/41] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RO | 14.07.2004 | Title | German: | Monodisperse Anionenaustauscher | [2003/27] | English: | Monodispersed anion exchanger | [2003/27] | French: | Echangeur d'anions monodispersés | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.12.2008 | [2010/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0046535 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-26 * example - *; | [Y]EP0464458 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-26 * page 3, line 4 - line 52; example - *; | [Y]EP0532894 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-26 * page 3, line 27 - line 48; example - *; | [Y]EP1078688 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; example -; claims 17-23 *; | [PA]DE10061544 (BAYER AG [DE]) [PA] * the whole document * |