EP1226961 - Ink jet printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawrence, Kristine B., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Chen, Tien-Teh, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Wang, Yongcai, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/31] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02075124.4 | 14.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | US20010770781 | 26.01.2001 Original published format: US 770781 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1226961 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1226961 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226961 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/36] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldruckverfahren | [2002/31] | English: | Ink jet printing method | [2002/31] | French: | Procédé d'impression par jet d'encre | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4575465 (VIOLA MICHAEL S [US]) [AD] 1-10 * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 32 ** claims 1,3-5,10 *; | [XD]US5856023 (CHEN YUNG T [US], et al) [XD] 1,7-10 * column 3, line 14 - line 35 * * column 4, line 18 - line 47 * * column 6, line 1 - line 3 * * claims 1,5-7 *; | [AD]EP1002660 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [AD] 1-10 * page 3, line 12 - line 32 * * page 6, line 41 - line 58 * * page 7 - page 11 * * page 11, line 43 - line 49 * * page 17, line 21 - line 36 *; | [X]US6068373 (CHEN YUNG T [US], et al) [X] 1,7-10 * column 3, line 21 - line 63 * * column 4, line 12 - line 45 * * column 6, line 46 - line 48 * * claims 1-3,5,6,15 * | by applicant | US4575465 | US5482545 | JPH09202043 | EP0802246 | US5856023 | EP1002660 |