|
24.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.10.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.06.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.04.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2015 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.05.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2007 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |