|
16.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
19.04.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.11.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2002 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |