EP1304083 - Apparatus for performing diagnostic and therapeutic modalities in the biliary tree [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Financial Services Centre, Bishop's Court Hill Saint Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2005/09] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited, a corporation duly organized under the laws of Ireland Financial Services Center, Bishop's Court Hill Saint Michael, Barbados / BB | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Financial Services Centre, Post Office Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill Saint Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION One Boston Scientific Place Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rowland, Christopher, A. 3 Stagecoach Drive Hopkinton, Massachusetts 01752 / US | 02 /
Eddy, Bryan, P. 204 Summitt Trail Broomfield, Colorado 80020 / US | 03 /
Vergano, Michael, G 12 Crestwood Court Cumberland, Rhode Island 02864 / US | 04 /
Cotton, Peter, B. Med.University of South Carolina Suite 910, CSB 171 Ashley Avenue Charleston, South Carolina 29425 / US | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02080287.2 | 15.05.1995 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | US19940242168 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: US 242168 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304083 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1304083 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00, A61B18/08 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
A61B18/10 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B17/22032 (EP,US);
A61B17/32056 (EP,US);
A61B17/320725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22051 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22082 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00553 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,US);
A61B2018/144 (EP,US);
A61M2025/004 (EP,US);
A61M25/0029 (EP,US);
A61M25/003 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/17] | A61B18/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2003/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Durchführung von diagnostischen oder therapeutischen Verfahren innerhalb der Gallengänge | [2003/17] | English: | Apparatus for performing diagnostic and therapeutic modalities in the biliary tree | [2003/17] | French: | Appareil pour effectuer des diagnostics et des interventions therapeutiques sur l'arbre biliaire | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95920602.0 / EP0844894 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950920602) is 23.04.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05115492 ; | [A]JPH04220245 ; | [A]EP0359447 (DEVICES VASCULAR INTERVENTION [US]) [A] 1-14,27 * column 8, line 18 - column 9, line 31; figures 4-6 *; | [A]EP0385588 (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 50; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4979951 (SIMPSON JOHN B [US]) [A] 1-14,27 * column A; figure - *; | [A]WO9212762 (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US]) [A] 1-14,27 * the whole document *; | US5323768 [ ] (SAITO TATSUYA [JP], et al) [ ] * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930826), vol. 017, no. 468, Database accession no. (C - 1102), & JP05115492 A 19930514 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-14,27 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921208), vol. 016, no. 566, Database accession no. (C - 1009), & JP04220245 A 19920811 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO LTD) [A] 1-14,27 * abstract * | by applicant | US3108593 | US4627837 | US4705041 | US5024617 | US5035696 | US5152772 |