EP1284273 - Estra-1,3,5(10)-trien-3-sulfamates a process for their production and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterix Limited 190 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3XE / GB | [2006/46] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Schering AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states JENAPHARM GmbH Otto-Schott-Strasse 15 D-07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Sigfried Ottogerd Mühlmann Strasse 17 D-07743 Jena / DE | 02 /
Walter, Elger Schorlemerallee 12 b D-14195 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Reddersen Gudrun Hügelstr.25 D-07749 Jena / DE | 04 /
Schneider, Birgitt Damaschkeweg 19 D-07745 Jena / DE | 05 /
Siemann, Hans-Joachim Fritz Ritter ST.6 D-07747 Jena / DE | [2010/12] |
Former [2003/08] | 01 /
Schwarz, Sigfried Ottogerd Mühlmann Strabe 17 D-07743 Jena / DE | ||
02 /
Walter, Elger Schorlemerallee 12 b D-14195 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Reddersen Gudrun Hügelstr.25 D-07749 Jena / DE | |||
04 /
Schneider, Birgitt Damaschkeweg 19 D-07745 Jena / DE | |||
05 /
Siemann, Hans-Joachim Fritz Ritter ST.6 D-07747 Jena / DE | Representative(s) | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Bradley, Adrian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2003/32] | Ziebig, Marlene K., Dr., et al Anwaltskanzlei, Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider, Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/25] | Rasch, Dorit, et al c/o Anwaltskanzlei, Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider, Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2003/08] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02090252.4 | 03.07.1995 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | DE19944429397 | 09.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4429397 | [2003/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284273 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284273 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284273 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07J41/00, A61K31/56, C07J53/00, C07J43/00, C07J51/00, A61P5/30 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
C07J43/003 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P5/26 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P5/34 (EP);
C07J41/0072 (EP,US);
C07J51/00 (EP,US);
C07J53/004 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/08] | C07J41/00, C07J53/00, A61K31/565, A61K31/58, A61P5/30, A61P15/18, C07J43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/08] | Title | German: | Estra-1,3,5(10)-trien-3-sulfamat Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese Verbindungen enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [2003/08] | English: | Estra-1,3,5(10)-trien-3-sulfamates a process for their production and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [2003/08] | French: | Dérivés Estra-1,3,5(10)-trien-3-sulfamates un procédé pour leur production et les compositions pharmaceutiques les conténant | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/08] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95925679.3 / EP0775155 | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/35] | IE | 29.09.2010 | |
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | IT | 29.09.2010 | |
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | NL | 29.09.2010 | |
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | SE | 29.09.2010 | |
GR | 30.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1949095 (JENAPHARM VEB) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 9 - line 18; examples 27-29 *; | [Y]US3697558 (BACH NICHOLAS J, et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]FR2133484 (JENAPHARM VEB [DD]) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 14 - line 18; examples 21-23,25,27 *; | [Y]DD114806 (S. SCHWARTZ) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, column 1, line 52 - line 59; examples 2-4,6,9,10 *; | [Y]DD201143 (SCHWARZ SIGFRID, et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, lines 6-8; examples 3-5 *; | [Y]US4656142 (JAOUEN GERARD [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * claim 3 *; | [Y] - SCHWARZ S ET AL, "Steroids. XI. 17.alpha.-Ethynylestradiol sulfamates", Z. CHEM., (1970), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 299 - 300, XP008030936 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - SCHWARZ S ET AL, "Steroids. 15. Sulfonyloxy derivatives of estrogens", PHARMAZIE, BERLIN DE, (1975), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 17 - 21, XP002026378 [Y] 1-4 * siehe verbindungen 18-25, 28-32, 59-62, 80, 81 und 110-113 * | [Y] - STOELZNER W ET AL, "Dissociation of the antigonadotrophic and the contraceptive activities of certain estratriene derivatives", PHARMAZIE, BERLIN DE, (1975), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 52 - 53, XP002026377 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - J. REYNOLDS, MARTINDALE, LONDON (UK), THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, (1989), 29, XP002282219 [Y] 1-4 * page 1408, column 3, paragraph L - page 1409, column 1, paragraph 3 * |