|
01.10.2007 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
01.08.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.03.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Decision on interlocutory revision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.07.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |