blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1274006

EP1274006 - Arithmetic unit and receiver unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited
7-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0722 / JP
[2009/04]
Former [2003/02]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kuroiwa, Koichi, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Taniguchi, Shoji, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Kanasugi, Masami, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Yamada, Yoshikazu, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2003/02]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date02251691.811.03.2002
[2003/02]
Priority number, dateJP2001020416205.07.2001         Original published format: JP 2001204162
[2003/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1274006
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1274006
Date:16.11.2005
[2005/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1274006
Date:20.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2005
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/30, H04B1/707, G06F7/50
[2005/46]
CPC:
G06F9/3001 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/02]G06F9/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/29]
Former [2003/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Recheneinheit und Empfangseinheit[2003/02]
English:Arithmetic unit and receiver unit[2003/02]
French:Unité arithmétique et unité de réception[2003/02]
Examination procedure18.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/12]
02.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2009Fee for grant paid
26.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52]
Request for further processing for:14.08.2007Request for further processing filed
14.08.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.10.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.03.2010
GB20.04.2010
[2011/17]
Former [2011/07]FR31.03.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US4490807  (CHEVILLAT PIERRE R [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,12 * column 4, line 20 - line 46 *;
 [A]US5583804  (SEAL DAVID J [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,12* column 5, line 7 - line 43 *;
 [A]US6088382  (MARU TSUGUO [JP]) [A] 1,2,12 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0101596  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1,2,12 * figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.