EP1395061 - Method and apparatus for compensation of erroneous motion vectors in video data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. 20 Frederick Sanger Road, The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YD / GB | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. 20 Frederick Sanger Road, The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YD / GB | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. 20 Frederick Sanger Road, The Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 5YD / GB | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to, 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghanbari, Soroush 4 Ferndown Court Stocton Close, Guildford, GU1 1HS / GB | 02 /
Cieplinski, Leszek 10 Ledger Close Guildford, GU1 2UF / GB | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255942.1 | 27.08.2002 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395061 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/68 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H04N19/895 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/48] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kompensation von falschen Bewegunsvektoren in Videodaten | [2004/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for compensation of erroneous motion vectors in video data | [2004/10] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la compensation des vecteurs de mouvement erronés dans les données vidéo | [2004/10] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 04.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/12] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0727910 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [A] 1-20 * page 4, line 6 - line 8 * * page 5, line 42 - line 45 * * figure 6 *; | [AD]US5737022 (YAMAGUCHI NOBORU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-20 * figures 8A,8B ** column A *; | [XY] - CHALIDABHONGSE J ET AL, "FAST MOTION VECTOR ESTIMATION USING MULTIRESOLUTION-SPATIO TEMPORALCORRELATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970601), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 477 - 488, XP000690586 [X] 1-6,10-17 * paragraph [00IV] * [Y] 7-9,18-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.585927 | [YA] - JAE-WON SUH ET AL, "Recovery of motion vectors for error concealment", TENCON 99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE REGION 10 CONFERENCE CHEJU ISLAND, SOUTH KOREA 15-17 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990915), ISBN 0-7803-5739-6, pages 750 - 753, XP010368320 [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0III] * [A] 1-6,10-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1999.818523 | [YA] - JIAN ZHANG ET AL, "Video error concealment using decoder motion vector estimation", TENCON '97. IEEE REGION 10 ANNUAL CONFERENCE. SPEECH AND IMAGE TECHNOLOGIES FOR COMPUTING AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS., PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE BRISBANE, QLD., AUSTRALIA 2-4 DEC. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971202), ISBN 0-7803-4365-4, pages 777 - 780, XP010264273 [Y] 18-20 * the whole document * [A] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.1997.648539 | [A] - KIM D-W ET AL, "Adaptive motion estimation based on spatio-temporal correlation", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980801), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 161 - 170, XP004129635 [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(98)80013-1 |