EP1324543 - Method to protect RPR networks of extended topology, in particular RPR ring to ring and meshed backbone networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busi, Italo Via Alfieri, 10 20023 Cerro Maggiore (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Fontana, Michele Via San Floriano, 5 23878 Verderio Superiore (Lecco) / IT | 03 /
Grandi, Pietro Via Fratelli Rosselli, 9 20139 Milano / IT | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Via Trento 30 20059 Vimercate / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Vimercate Via Trento, 30 20059 Vimercate / IT | Application number, filing date | 02290717.4 | 21.03.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | EP20010403365 | 26.12.2001 Original published format: EP 01403365 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1324543 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L12/56, H04L12/437 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
H04L12/437 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schutz von RPR Netzen mit erweiterter Topologie, insbesondere RPR Ring zu Ring und vermaschte Hauptnetze | [2003/27] | English: | Method to protect RPR networks of extended topology, in particular RPR ring to ring and meshed backbone networks | [2003/27] | French: | Méthode pour la protection de réseaux RPR à topologie étendue, en particulier pour les interconnections "anneau RPR à anneau RPR" et maillées | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5218604 (SOSNOSKY JOSEPH [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 30 - line 64 * * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 19 * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y] - SZE D T W, "A METROPOLITAN AREA NETWORK", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (198511), vol. SAC-3, no. 6, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 815 - 824, XP000810124 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 818, paragraph A - page 819, paragraph D * * page 822, paragraph H - page 823, paragraph I * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.1985.1146279 | [Y] - "An introduction to Resilient Packet Ring Topology", WHITE PAPER BY THE RESILIENT PACKET RING ALLIANCE, (200110), pages 1 - 16, URL: www.rpralliance.org, (20020515), XP002198916 [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] * | [DA] - N. COLE, J. HAWKINS, M. GREEN, R. SHARMA, K. VASANI, "Resilient Packet Rings for Metro Networks", GLOBAL OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, (20010829), pages 142 - 146, URL: www.rpralliance.org, (20020515), XP002198917 [DA] 1-11 * paragraph [INTRODUCTION] * |