EP1426374 - NAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY, INC. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa, Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY, INC. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa, Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBUTANI, Tadao 149-1, Aza Miyanohigashi, Kitahama, Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-0015 / JP | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02700656.8 | 21.02.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002JP01520 | Priority number, date | JP20010252565 | 23.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001252565 | [2004/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018580 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426374 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61P25/04, A61P29/00, A61P3/10, A61P43/00 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4375 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/31] | C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61P25/04, A61P29/00, A61P3/10, A61P43/00, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00) | ||
Former IPC [2004/24] | C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61P25/04, A61P29/00, A61P3/10, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | NAPHTHYRIDINDERIVAT | [2004/24] | English: | NAPHTHYRIDINE DERIVATIVE | [2004/24] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE NAPHTHYRIDINE | [2010/32] |
Former [2004/24] | DERIVES DE NAPHTHYRIDINE | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2004 | Translation filed | 04.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 23.03.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2004 | 28.02.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO9902527 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JPH07304775 (OTSUKA PHARMA FACTORY INC); | [A]JPH072779 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC); | [A]JPH0517475 (SAPPORO BREWERIES); | [A]JPH0710875 (GREEN CROSS CORP) | Examination | EP0997463 |