EP1352518 - ADAPTIVE SENSITIVITY CONTROL, ON A PIXEL-BY-PIXEL BASIS, FOR A DIGITAL IMAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Request for preliminary examination | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smal Camera Technologies, INC. 10 Wilson Road, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02138-1128 / US | [2009/10] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Smal Camera Technologies, INC. 10 Wilson Road, 3rd Floor Cambridge, MA 02138-1128 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASAKI, Ichiro 73 Guggins Lane Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | 02 /
Brooks, Lane, Gearle 299 Washington Street, 1 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 03 /
SIKRI, Vivek 55 Winchester Street 3 Medford, MA 02155 / US | 04 /
FIFE, Keith, G. 105 Brookline Street 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2008/41] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
MASAKI, Ichiro 73 Guggins Lane Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | ||
02 /
AGARWALLA, Nilesh 56 Concetta Sass Drive Randolph, MA 02368 / US | |||
03 /
SIKRI, Vivek 55 Winchester Street 3 Medford, MA 02155 / US | |||
04 /
FIFE, Keith, G. 105 Brookline Street 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Representative(s) | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 02701929.8 | 04.01.2002 | [2003/42] | WO2002US00551 | Priority number, date | US20010261023P | 11.01.2001 Original published format: US 261023 P | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02056584 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352518 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352518 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/235, H04N3/15 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H04N23/617 (EP,US);
H04N25/575 (EP,US);
H04N23/65 (EP,US);
H04N23/70 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,US);
H04N25/571 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANGEPASSTE EMPFINDLICHKEITSSTEUERUNG AUF EINER PIXEL-ZU-PIXEL-BASIS FÜR EINE DIGITALE BILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG | [2003/42] | English: | ADAPTIVE SENSITIVITY CONTROL, ON A PIXEL-BY-PIXEL BASIS, FOR A DIGITAL IMAGER | [2003/42] | French: | COMMANDE DE SENSIBILITE ADPTATIVE, A BASE PIXEL PAR PIXEL, DESTINEE A UN SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION D'IMAGES NUMERIQUE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.03.2009 | [2011/14] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19740910 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 60; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO9966560 (FOVEON INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6-8* page 15, line 8 - page 16, line 28; figures 3,8-10 *; | [X]US6040570 (LEVINE PETER ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 12, line 61 - column 14, line 15; figures 1,5A,5B *; | [X]US6101294 (MCCAFFREY NATHANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 33; figure 2 *; | [PX]EP1119188 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [PX] 1,6 * column 6, line 13 - line 58; figures 2,3 *; | [ED]WO0211426 (SMAL CAMERA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [ED] 1 * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 3; figures 2-4 * |