|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
22.08.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
15 |
|
06.12.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.04.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.09.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
22.01.2002 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |