EP1420725 - WOVEN ORTHOPEDIC IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2006/41] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states SDGI Holdings, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 508 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISERMANN, Lukas 42 Riverview Drive West 301 Memphis, TN 38103 / US | 02 /
RAY, Eddie, F., III 1781 Fernhill Cove Collierville, TN 38017 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Armin, et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kühn, Armin, et al Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02706475.7 | 27.02.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002US06211 | Priority number, date | US20010272246P | 28.02.2001 Original published format: US 272246 P | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02067824 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1420725 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420725 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/68 (EP,US);
A61B17/8085 (EP,US);
A61F2/2846 (EP,US);
A61F2/441 (EP,US);
A61F2/446 (EP,US);
A61B17/7059 (EP,US);
A61B17/842 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,US);
A61F2/0077 (EP,US);
A61F2/08 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0086 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30004 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30014 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3007 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3008 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30131 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30153 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30235 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30237 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30461 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30583 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30599 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30622 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30914 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3093 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30971 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4435 (EP,US);
A61F2002/448 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0019 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0085 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0041 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0013 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0019 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2240/001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0014 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0063 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0098 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00029 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00071 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00161 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00365 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00952 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00958 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBTES ORTHOPÄDISCHES IMPLANTAT | [2007/13] | English: | WOVEN ORTHOPEDIC IMPLANTS | [2004/22] | French: | IMPLANTS ORTHOPEDIQUES TISSES | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/22] | GEWEBTES OTHOPÄDISCHES IMPLANTAT | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | BE | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IT | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | ES | 17.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | GB | 27.02.2009 | IE | 27.02.2009 | LU | 27.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
GB | 27.02.2009 | ||
IE | 27.02.2009 | ||
LU | 27.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
GB | 27.02.2009 | ||
IE | 27.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
GB | 27.02.2009 | ||
IE | 27.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 27.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
IE | 27.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
BE | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 06.08.2008 | |
ES | 17.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5380328 (MORGAN FRANK H [US]) [Y] 3,4,6-8,11,15-20,32,35-37 * column 1, line 27 - line 38 * * column 4, line 41 - line 44 * * column 6, line 30 - line 58 * * column 7, line 28 - line 54 * * column 8, line 28 - line 37 * * figures 6-8 *; | [Y]US6077076 (COMFORT CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [Y] 2,14 * column 4, line 6 - line 15 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 2 * * column 6, line 42 - line 45 * * figure 5 *; | [XY]WO0112081 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * figures 5,6 * [Y] 2-4,6-8,11,14-20,32,35-37; | [PX]EP1088533 (SULZER ORTHOPEDICS LTD [CH]) [PX] 1-3,5,8-13,16,20,22,32-34,36-39 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] ** figure - * |