blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1355838

EP1355838 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVEYING WORK PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 04.05.2011  [2011/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schuler Automation GmbH & Co. KG
Louis-Schuler-Strasse 1
91093 Hessdorf / DE
[2003/44]
Inventor(s)01 / VOGEL, Norbert
Dompfaffstr. 41
91088 Bubenreuth / DE
 [2003/44]
Representative(s)Gassner, Wolfgang
Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Marie-Curie-Strasse 1
91052 Erlangen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr.
Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a
91052 Erlangen / DE
Application number, filing date02706640.629.01.2002
[2003/44]
WO2002DE00304
Priority number, dateDE200110451031.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10104510
[2003/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO02060788
Date:08.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1355838
Date:29.10.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1355838
Date:15.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/38]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1355838
Date:04.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2003
ClassificationIPC:B65G1/00
[2003/44]
CPC:
B65G21/2036 (EP,US); B65G47/911 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/44]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPORT VON WERKSTÜCKEN[2003/44]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVEYING WORK PIECES[2003/44]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRANSPORT DE PIECES[2003/44]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2003National basic fee paid 
06.06.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/44]
17.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2004Fee for grant paid
25.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.2005  27.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
NSM Magnettechnik GmbH
Lützowstrasse 21
D-59399 Olfen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hennicke, Ernst Rüdiger
Patentanwälte
Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus
Postfach 19 04 08
50501 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/33]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.2005  27.06.2005  ADMISSIBLE
NSM Magnettechnik GmbH
Lützowstrasse 21
D-59399 Olfen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hennicke, Ernst Rüdiger, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus Postfach 19 04 08
50501 Köln / DE
05.08.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.12.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.11.2007Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.12.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.12.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.12.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
24.03.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition08.02.2008Appeal received No.  T0323/08
09.04.2008Statement of grounds filed
11.12.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
11.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI15.09.2004
FR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
CY29.01.2005
LU29.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
PT15.02.2005
CH31.01.2006
LI31.01.2006
[2008/04]
Former [2007/20]FI15.09.2004
FR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
CY29.01.2005
LU29.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
CH31.01.2006
LI31.01.2006
Former [2007/11]FI15.09.2004
FR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
LU29.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
CH31.01.2006
LI31.01.2006
Former [2007/03]FI15.09.2004
FR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
BE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
CH31.01.2006
LI31.01.2006
Former [2006/52]FI15.09.2004
FR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
BE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/32]FI15.09.2004
FR15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
BE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/14]FI15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
BE31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
FR16.09.2005
Former [2006/13]FI15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
NL15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
BE31.01.2005
Former [2005/46]FI15.09.2004
GB15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI15.09.2004
IE15.09.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI15.09.2004
GR15.12.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI15.09.2004
SE15.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE15.12.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]US4735449  (KUMA TOSIMI [JP]) [A] * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 2; figures 1,5,29 *;
 [A]US5857605  (WELCH HAROLD D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 39 - line 56; figure 4 *;
 [DA]DE29920893U  (NSM MAGNETTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,20 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 11; figures 1,2 *
OppositionEP0893372
 EP1061020
 WO0222479
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.