|
04.05.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.03.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.03.2018 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.10.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.08.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
98 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.12.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
09.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
32 |