EP1374067 - POLICY GATEWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AudioCodes Texas, Inc. Suite 100 3000 Technology Drive Plano TX 75074 / US | [2007/27] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Netrake Corporation Suite 100, 3000 Technology Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHER, Robert, Daniel, III 7401 Gurney Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 02 /
RANA, Aswinkumar, Vishanji 6532 Shady Point Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 03 /
LIE, Milton, Andre 5913 Spring Hill Drive McKinney, TX 75070 / US | 04 /
STROTHER, Travis, Ernest 7501 Belmount Road Rowlett, TX 75089 / US | 05 /
HERVIN, Mark, Warden 3605 Bent Ridge Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | 06 /
DEERMAN, James, Robert 15 White Rock Trail Lucas, TX 75002 / US | 07 /
CARMAN, John, Raymond 90 Seattle Slew Lane Fairview, TX 75069 / US | 08 /
MAXWELL, Larry, Gene 14439 Dennis Lane Farmers Branch, TX 75234 / US | [2004/20] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
MAHER, Robert, Daniel, III 7401 Gurney Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | ||
02 /
RANA, Aswinkumar, Vishanji 3213 Upshire Court Plano, TX 75075 / US | |||
03 /
LIE, Milton, Andre 5913 Spring Hill Drive McKinney, TX 75070 / US | |||
04 /
STROTHER, Travis, Ernest 7501 Belmount Road Rowlett, TX 75089 / US | |||
05 /
HERVIN, Mark, Warden 3605 Bent Ridge Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | |||
06 /
DEERMAN, James, Robert 15 White Rock Trail Lucas, TX 75002 / US | |||
07 /
CARMAN, John, Raymond 90 Seattle Slew Lane Fairview, TX 75069 / US | |||
08 /
MAXWELL, Larry, Gene 14439 Dennis Lane Farmers Branch, TX 75234 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02717613.0 | 14.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US07506 | Priority number, date | US20010279468P | 28.03.2001 Original published format: US 279468 P | US20010832670 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: US 832670 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02080004 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374067 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L41/0856 (EP,US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L45/302 (EP,US);
H04L45/306 (EP,US);
H04L47/20 (EP,US);
H04L47/22 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | G06F13/00, H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RICHTLINIEN-GATEWAY | [2004/01] | English: | POLICY GATEWAY | [2004/01] | French: | PASSERELLE DE POLITIQUES | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 05.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2007 | 31.03.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - WEIBIN ZHAO, DAVID OLSHEFSKI, HENNING SCHULZRINNE, "Internet Quality of Service: an Overview (2000)", CUCS-003-00 , COLUMBIA UNIV.,, (200002), URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/zhao00internet.html, (20050912), XP002345037 [X] 1-23 * paragraph [2.MOTIVATION] * * paragraph [4.1.INTEGRATED.SERVICES] * * paragraph [4.2.DIFFERANTIATED.SERVICES] * * paragraph [5.1.BASIC.PACKET.FORWARDING.OPERATION] * * paragraph [5.3.SCHEDULING] * * paragraph [6.1.ADMISSION.CONTROL] * * paragraph [6.2.POLICY.CONTROL] * | [X] - PMC SIERRE, "TOWARD CONTENT-BASED CLASSIFICATION", PMC SIERRA WHITE PAPERS ISSUE 1, (200102), XP002345038 [X] 1-23 * paragraph [4.3.CLASSIFICATION] * * paragraph [4.5.EDITING.AND.SCHEDULING] * * paragraph [5.1.1.DATA.PATH.REQUIREMENT] * | [A] - BLAKE S ET AL, "RFC 2475: An Architecture for Differentiated Services", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (199812), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008259 [A] 1-23 * paragraph [2.1.DIFFERENTIATED.SERVICES.DOMAIN] * * paragraph [2.3.TRAFFIC.CLASSIFICATION.AND.CONDITIONING] * | [A] - YAVATKAR R ET AL, "RFC 2753 A Framework for Policy-based Admission Control", IETF, (200001), XP002179102 [A] 11-23 * paragraph [3.POLICY.BASED.ADMISSION.CONTROL] * * paragraph [4.ARCHITECTURAL.ELEMENTS]; figures 1,2 * | [A] - RAJAN/S KAMAT/J C MARTIN AT&T/IBM/SUN MICROSYSTEMS M SEE/ R CHAUDHURY IBM/XYLAN/ TELSTRA D VERMA/ G POWERS/ R YAVATKAR IBM/ PACKET, "Policy Action Classes for Differentiated Services and Integrated Services", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (19990405), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015034208 [A] 1-23 * paragraph [1.PURPOSE.AND.OVERVIEW] * * paragraph [2.THE.SUBCLASS.DIFFSERVACTION.] * | International search | [Y]US5499238 (SHON SEUNG W [KR]); | [A]US5619497 (GALLAGHER BRIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6157955 (NARAD CHARLES E [US], et al); | [A]US6189037 (ADAMS ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US6208640 (SPELL DAVID [US], et al) |