EP1391446 - GAS GENERATOR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBO, Dairi 3-14, Kitahirano 3-chome Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0893 / JP | 02 /
SATO, E.; c/o Himeji Factory of Nippon Kayaku K.K 3903-39, Toyotomi, Toyotomi-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 679-2123 / JP | 03 /
IKEDA, K.; c/o Himeji Factory of Nippon KayakuK.K 3903-39, Toyotomi, Toyotomi-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 679-2123 / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02720497.3 | 18.04.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002JP03881 | Priority number, date | JP20010123086 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001123086 | JP20010300166 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001300166 | [2004/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02085817 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391446 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C06B31/28, C06B33/04, C06B43/00, C06D5/00, B60R21/26 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
C06B31/28 (EP,KR,US);
C06D5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASERZEUGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2004/09] | English: | GAS GENERATOR COMPOSITION | [2004/09] | French: | COMPOSITION DE GENERATEUR DE GAZ | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2003 | Translation filed | 14.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 09.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB544675 (DU PONT, et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 15 - line 44; claim - *; | [DXY]EP0405272 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DX] 1-5,7-9 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 28; example 3; claim - * [Y] 10-27; | [DA]US5071630 (OBERTH ADOLF E [US]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 35 - line 54; claim - *; | [Y]WO9504710 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [Y] 10-27 * claim - *; | [DA]US6039820 (HINSHAW JERALD C [US], et al) [DA] 1-27 * claim - *; | [DA]WO0018704 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 28; examples 2-4,6; claim - *; | [Y]WO0039054 (AUTOLIV ASP INC [US]) [Y] 10-27 * page 8, line 21 - line 14 * * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 23 *; | [DY]WO0100544 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP], et al)[DY] 11; | [PA]WO0147811 (AUTOLIV ASP INC [US]) [PA] 1 * page 8, line 18 - line 27; claim - *; | [T]EP1205457 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [T] 11 * example -; claim - * | International search | [X]WO9806486 (THIOKOL CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO9842642 (DAICEL CHEM [JP], et al); | [X]WO0100544 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP], et al) |