EP1436139 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ABDOMINAL BELT AND MOULD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundae Medical Co., Ltd. 1242-7, Jeongwang-2dong Siheung 429-848 / KR | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAE, Joon-suk, Mockdong-shinsigaji Apartment 1411 Dong 104 Ho, 329, Shinjung-dong Yangcheon-gu, Seoul 158-070 / KR | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02720658.0 | 19.04.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002KR00721 | Priority number, date | KR20010063558 | 16.10.2001 Original published format: KR 2001063558 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033245 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436139 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/04, A61F5/02 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
B29C66/472 (EP,US);
B29C65/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61F5/028 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/433 (EP,US);
B29C66/45 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/17] | B29C65/04, A61H21/00, A61F5/02 | ||
Former IPC [2004/29] | B29C65/04, A61H21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES UNTERLEIBGÜRTELS UND FORMWERKZEUG | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ABDOMINAL BELT AND MOULD | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CEINTURE ABDOMINALE, ET MOULE CORRESPONDANT | [2006/20] |
Former [2004/29] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CEINTURE ABDOMINALE, ET MOULE CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 19.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60131226 ; | [A]US3234064 (GEORGE SMITH) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 12 ** figure - *; | [A]US4743328 (ZWIRNER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]WO9532690 (ROYCE MEDICAL CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 14, line 26 - page 21, line 27 * * figures 11-18 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851120), vol. 009, no. 294, Database accession no. (M - 431), & JP60131226 A 19850712 (TOSHIO NISHINO) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5690609 (HEINZE III FRANK D [US]); | [A]KR20000066548 (JANG IK CHUN [KR]); | [A]KR20000073327 (IDEANURI [KR]); | [A]US4836194 (SEBASTIAN PETER R [US], et al); | [A]JPH10245701 (KUSAKABE TAKESHI); | [A]JP2000005207 (KANEKO MARIKO) |