EP1386398 - ANTIFUSE REROUTE OF DIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716-9632 / US | [2016/01] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, Idaho 83716-9632 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUESMAN, Kevin 4550 Oregon Trail Place Boise, ID 83716 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/01] |
Former [2011/16] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Keltie, David Arthur, et al Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | ||
Former [2004/06] | Keltie, David Arthur, et al David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 02721425.3 | 15.03.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002US07916 | Priority number, date | US20010809537 | 15.03.2001 Original published format: US 809537 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02075926 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1386398 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1386398 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/06, G11C29/48, H01L23/525, H03K17/693, H03K19/173 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
H03K19/1736 (EP,US);
G11C5/12 (KR);
G11C29/48 (EP,US);
G11C5/06 (EP,US);
H01L23/525 (EP,US);
H01L23/5252 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | H03K19/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | UMLEITUNG VON SIGNALEN AUF IC'S MIT ANTISCHMELZSICHERUNGEN | [2004/06] | English: | ANTIFUSE REROUTE OF DIES | [2004/06] | French: | RACHEMINEMENTS PAR ANTIFUSIBLES SUR LES MICROCIRCUITS | [2015/30] |
Former [2004/06] | R ACHEMINEMENTS PAR ANTIFUSIBLES SUR LES MICROCIRCUITS | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 16.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP09160308.4 / EP2088675 | EP10186003.9 / EP2285002 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.2015 | BE | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | IE | 15.03.2016 | LU | 15.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 15.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5219782 (LIU DAVID K-Y [US], et al) [A] 8-10 * column 6, line 30 - line 47; figure 5 *; | [XY]US5926035 (RAZA S BABAR [US]) [X] 1-9,13-24,47-64 * column 2, line 12 - line 17 * * column 4, line 19 - line 67 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 50; figures 1,5,6,9,10 * [Y] 10-12; | [A]US5936908 (LOUGHMILLER DANIEL R [US], et al) [A] 47,56* column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 8; figure 1 *; | [XY]US5966027 (KAPUSTA RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 75 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 7 * [Y] 10-12; | [YA]US6157207 (EATON DAVID D [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 7 * * column 5, line 19 - line 50; figure 9 * [A] 75; | [Y] - "ENGINEERING CHANGE PAD SHARING WITH FUSIBLE LINKS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19880801), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 330 - 334, XP000097563 [Y] 1-9 * column W * | by applicant | - "ENGINEERING CHANGE PAD SHARING WITH FUSIBLE LINKS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP, (19880801), vol. 31, pages 330 - 334 |