EP1382154 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPUTER SECURITY USING MULTIPLE CAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYMANTEC CORPORATION 350 Ellis Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states SYMANTEC CORPORATION 20330 Stevens Creek Boulevard Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORKIN, Stephen 810 Coleman Ave. 16 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
LYLE, Michael 2844 Buena Knoll Court San Jose, CA 95121 / US | 03 /
ROSS, Robert, F. 151 Calderon 334 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 04 /
MARICONDO, James, R. 872 Ames Court Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/04] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02721805.6 | 23.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002US12842 | Priority number, date | US20010841700 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: US 841700 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02087155 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382154 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382154 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1382154 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
H04L63/1408 (EP,US);
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
H04L63/1491 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99939 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR COMPUTERSICHERHEIT UNTER VERWENDUNG MEHRERER KÄFIGE | [2004/04] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPUTER SECURITY USING MULTIPLE CAGES | [2004/04] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ASSURER LA SECURITE INFORMATIQUE AU MOYEN DE PLUSIEURS CAGES | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | IE | 23.04.2012 | LU | 23.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
IE | 23.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0104759 (RECOURSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 12, line 5 - page 15, line 7 * * figures 2,3 * * page 34, line 17 - page 35, line 11 *; | [X]WO0104757 (RECOURSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 12, line 3 - page 15, line 6 * * page 34, line 14 - page 35, line 8 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO0105168 (RECOURSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 12, line 5 - page 16, line 7 * * page 34, line 17 - page 35, line 11 ** figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO0106373 (RECOURSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 12, line 1 - page 15, line 3 * * page 34, line 12 - page 35, line 6 * * figures 2,3,6 * | International search | [Y]US4719566 (KELLEY HENRY H [US]); | [Y]US5345590 (AULT DONALD F [US], et al); | [A]US5928363 (RUVOLO JOANN [US]); | [AP]US2002066034 (SCHLOSSBERG BARRY J [US], et al); | [Y] - CHESWICK BILL, "An evening with Berferd in which a cracker is lured, endured and studied", AT & T BELL LABS, (1990), pages 1 - 13, XP002952580 | [Y] - STAGGS MICHAEL, "IDS:RE: cybercop sting", UNIVERSITY OF WOLLONGONG, AUSTRALIA, (19991008), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.shmoo.com/mail/ids/oct99/msg00467.html, XP002952579 | [Y] - SPITZNER LANCE, "To build a honeypot", LANCE SPITZNER WEB SITE, (19991010), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.archive.org/web/19991013141306/http://enteract.com/~1spitz/honeypot.html, XP002952578 | [Y] - COHEN FRED, "A mathematical structure of simple defensive network deceptions", FRED COHEN & ASSOC., (1999), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.all.net/journal/deception/mathdeception/mathdeception.html, XP002952577 | [Y] - "Network associates ships cybercop sting", NETWORK ASSOCIATES, (19990716), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.infowar.com/P_and_s/99/p_n_s_071699d_j.shtml, XP002952576 | [Y] - COHEN FRED, "Internet holes-internet lightening rods", MANAGEMENT ANALYTICS, (1996), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.all.net/journal/netsec/9607-2.html, XP002952575 | [Y] - MESSMER ELLEN, "Decoy server helps track down hackers NWFusion focus", NEWSGROUPS:ALT.2600 NEWS:37B88C12.9479112ONETNEWS.WORLDNET.ATT.NET, (19990812), URL: http://www.groups.google.com/groups, XP002952573 | [Y] - "CyberCop sting-industry's 1st decoy server silently traces & tracks hacker activity", NEWSGROUPS:ALT2000.NL, (19990715), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://biz.yahoo.com/prnews/990714/ca_ntwrk_a_1.html, XP002952574 | [A] - "Decoy nets' gain backers in battle against hackers network world", NETWORK WORLD, (20010306), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.itworld.com/sec/2210/NWW010306decoy/, XP002952572 | [A] - COHEN FRED, "A note on the role of deception in information protection", FRED COHEN & ASSOC., (1998), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://www.all.net/journal/deception/deception.html, XP002952571 | [A] - EVEN LORAS, "What is a Honeypot?", SANS INSTITUTE, (20000712), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.sans.org/netlook/resources/IDFAQ/honeypot3.htm, XP002952570 | [A] - "HONEYNET.ORG know your enemy: Honeynets", HONEYNET PROJECT WEB SITE, (20010421), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20010428053525/http://project.honeynet.org/, XP002952569 | by applicant | WO0106373 |