|
20.06.2018 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2018 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.03.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.01.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.01.2015 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
18.03.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |