EP1381532 - MAST PAYLOAD DOCKING STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engineered Support Systems, Inc. 201 Evans Lane St. Louis Missouri 63121 / US | For all designated states Carter, Edward V. 101 Giberson Court Edwardsville, IL 62025 / US | For all designated states Fitzgerald, Jeffrey S. 2015 New Sun Drive Florissant, MO 63031 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states Engineered Support Systems, Inc. 201 Evans Lane St. Louis, Missouri 63121 / US | ||
For all designated states Carter, Edward V. 101 Giberson Court Edwardsville, IL 62025 / US | |||
For all designated states Fitzgerald, Jeffrey S. 2015 New Sun Drive Florissant, MO 63031 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Edward, V. 101 Giberson Court Edwardsville, IL 62025 / US | 02 /
FITZGERALD, Jeffrey, S. 2015 New Sun Drive Florissant, MO 63031 / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 02728954.5 | 24.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002US12890 | Priority number, date | US20010844941 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: US 844941 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02087921 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1381532 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381532 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/04, F16M11/12, F16M13/00, F16F15/06, G02B23/16, B60S9/02 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
B60R11/04 (EP,US);
F16F15/06 (EP,US);
F16M11/08 (EP,US);
F16M11/12 (EP,US);
F16M11/18 (EP,US);
F16M11/2057 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | F16M13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2004/04] | B60R1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/04] |
Former [2004/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASTNUTZLASTANDOCKSTATION | [2004/04] | English: | MAST PAYLOAD DOCKING STATION | [2004/04] | French: | STATION D'ANCRAGE A UNE CHARGE UTILE A MAT | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3703999 (FORYS EDWARD LOUIS, et al) [A] 1,13-15,21-23,26,30,31,34 * column 3, line 3 - line 64 * * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 41; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0128312 (WEGMANN & CO [DE]) [A] 1,15,16,23-26,31-34 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4514068 (URQUHART KEVIN G [AU]) [A] 1-3,26,34* figures 1,2,4,6,7; claim 1 *; | [A]US4913458 (HAMILTON MARK L [US]) [A] 1,15,16,23-26,31-34 * column 4, line 65 - column 6, line 46; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]US4118707 (YOSHIDA TAKASHI, et al); | [A]US4162708 (JOHNSON PHILLIP R [US]); | [A]US4582291 (MATTHEWS ROBERT J [US]) |