blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1390572

EP1390572 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A MULTILAYER BLENDED CORE AND A METHOD OF FORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Revocation of patentpublished on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[2012/19]
Former [2004/09]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FELL, David, Arthur
2055 Lynn Drive
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
02 / GEORGER, William, Anthony
4468 W. Amberwood Lane
Appleton, WI 54913 / US
03 / SUPRISE, Jody, Dorothy
W3151 Archer Court
Pine River, WI 54965 / US
 [2004/20]
Former [2004/09]01 / FELL, David, Arthur
2055 Lynn Drive
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
02 / GEORGER, William, Anthony
2042 Lynn Drive
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
03 / SUPRISE, Jody, Dorothy
W3151 Archer Court
Pine River, WI 54965 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/19]Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2004/09]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date02733818.504.03.2002
[2004/09]
WO2002US06426
Priority number, dateUS2001085436011.05.2001         Original published format: US 854360
[2004/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO02092898
Date:21.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1390572
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1390572
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/15, D04H5/06, A61F13/535, A61F13/534
[2011/47]
CPC:
A61F13/53418 (EP,US); A61F13/15 (KR); A61F13/535 (EP,US);
D04H5/06 (EP,US); A61F2013/53035 (EP,US); A61F2013/530364 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2004/09]D04H5/06, A61F13/535, A61F13/534
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/09]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINEM VERMISCHTEN MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ABSORBIERENDEN KERN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2004/09]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A MULTILAYER BLENDED CORE AND A METHOD OF FORMING[2004/09]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT AVEC NOYAU MELANGE MULTICOUCHE ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE CET ARTICLE[2004/09]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2003National basic fee paid 
04.12.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/09]
28.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2012Fee for grant paid
21.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.02.2013  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2018/23]
Former [2015/01]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2013  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB
Patent Department
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2013/12]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2013  12.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB
Patent Department
SE-405 03 Göteborg / SE
15.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
09.07.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.07.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
08.07.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/33]
Appeal following opposition09.09.2014Appeal received No.  T1898/14
19.11.2014Statement of grounds filed
22.06.2018Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
DK09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
TR09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
IE04.03.2013
LU04.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
DK09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
TR09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
IE04.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
DK09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
IE04.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2014/07]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
DK09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
IE04.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
Former [2013/47]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
DK09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
ES20.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/08]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
DK09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT09.05.2012
BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/04]BE09.05.2012
CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2013/01]CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
PT10.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
GR10.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY09.05.2012
FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
Former [2012/48]FI09.05.2012
SE09.05.2012
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4673402  (WEISMAN PAUL T [US], et al) [X] 3,12-17 * column A * * column 6, lines 17-35 * * column 8, lines 3-12; figure 1; tables I,II * [A] 18,23;
 [XY]FR2656794  (PEAUDOUCE SA [FR]) [X] 3,8-11 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 11; figure - * [Y] 18-30,32;
 [X]US5188624  (YOUNG SR RICHARD H [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 40 - column 10, line 54; figure - *;
 [X]US5334177  (COHEN RICHMOND R [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,18-34,37* column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 10; figure - *;
 [X]EP0719531  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11,18-37 * page 5, lines 35,36 * * page 7, lines 46-59 * * page 9, lines 48,49; figure - *;
 [X]WO9847456  (BUCKEYE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim - *;
 [X]US5891119  (TA KOUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column W *;
 [X]WO0029658  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP1057465  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 12-17,31,33-37 * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 33 * * page 10, lines 39-47; figure - * [Y] 18-30,32
by applicantUS4673402
 WO9831858
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.