|
30.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.08.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.07.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.05.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
35 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
27 |