EP1494558 - STRAP BUCKLE FOR A FASTENING STRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MSA Auer GmbH Thiemannstrasse 1 12059 Berlin / DE | [2005/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSS, Jürgen Alpnacher Weg 5 13089 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KLING, Peter Kleineweg 115 12101 Berlin / DE | [2006/47] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
BOSS, Jürgen Rathenower Strasse 30 10559 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
KLING, Peter Kleineweg 115 12101 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2005/02] | 01 /
BOSS, Jürgen Rathenower Strasse 30 10559 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
KLING, Peter Liegnitzer Strasse 1 10999 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02740261.9 | 12.04.2002 | [2005/02] | WO2002DE01438 | Priority number, date | DE2001119469 | 12.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10119469 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02082938 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494558 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494558 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1494558 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/12, B60P7/08 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
B60P7/0838 (EP);
A44B11/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GURTSCHNALLE FÜR EINEN BEFESTIGUNGSGURT | [2005/02] | English: | STRAP BUCKLE FOR A FASTENING STRAP | [2005/02] | French: | BOUCLE DE CEINTURE POUR CEINTURE DE FIXATION | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.2003 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | IE | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | AT | 12.04.2007 | LU | 12.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | CH | 30.04.2007 | LI | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
LU | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
AT | 12.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
IE | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 13.09.2006 | |
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 13.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4395796 (AKAURA SEISHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 57 - line 60 * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 2; figure 3 *; | [A]US4796336 (SCULLY ANDREW J [US]) [A] 1* column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 17; figure - *; | [AD]DE19541286 (AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 41; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0906732 (MIEDERHOFF FRANZ FA [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * |